WI AB319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 111.36 (2); to amend 15.04 (1) (g), 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 36.09 (1) (e), 36.11 (3) (a), 36.12 (1), 36.29 (1), 38.04 (13) (b), 38.23 (1), 47.02 (3m) (f), 48.82 (6), 51.90, 66.0125 (3) (a), 66.0125 (3) (c) 1. b., 66.0125 (9), 66.1011 (1), 66.1201 (2m), 66.1213 (3), 66.1301 (2m), 66.1331 (2m), 66.1333 (3) (e) 2., 86.195 (5) (c), 106.50 (1), 106.50 (1m) (h), 106.50 (1m) (nm), 106.50 (5m) (f) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 1., 106.52 (3) (a) 2., 106.52 (3) (a) 3., 106.52 (3) (a) 4., 106.52 (3) (a) 5., 106.58, 111.31 (1), 111.31 (2), 111.31 (3), 111.321, 111.36 (title), 111.36 (1) (a), 111.36 (1) (c), 111.36 (1) (d) 1., 111.36 (1) (d) 2., 111.70 (2), 111.81 (12) (b), 111.85 (2) (b), 118.019 (2d), 118.13 (1), 118.20 (1), 118.40 (4) (b) 2., 194.025, 224.77 (1) (o), 227.10 (3) (a), 230.01 (2) (b), 230.18, 234.29, 321.37, 440.45 (1), 440.45 (2), 452.14 (3) (n), 625.12 (2), 632.35 and 756.001 (3); and to create 106.50 (1m) (kg), 106.52 (1) (cr), 111.32 (7j) and 628.34 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: discrimination in employment, housing, public accommodations, education, insurance coverage, jury duty, and the receipt of mental health or vocational rehabilitation services. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination in employment, housing, public accommodations, education, insurance coverage, jury duty, and the receipt of mental health or vocational rehabilitation services. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-03HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2019-06-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback