WI AB317 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.118 of the statutes; Relating to: Department of Natural Resources' efforts to raise awareness about Lyme disease. (FE)
Title
Department of Natural Resources' efforts to raise awareness about Lyme disease. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab317 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB317.pdf |