WI AB316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Referred to committee on Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 23.1165 of the statutes; Relating to: making insect repellant available for sale in state parks and state forests. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making insect repellant available for sale in state parks and state forests. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-09-12HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2019-09-03HouseExecutive action taken
2019-08-19HouseRepresentative Oldenburg added as a coauthor
2019-08-15HousePublic hearing held
2019-08-15HouseRepresentative Kitchens added as a coauthor
2019-07-25HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Environment
2019-06-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback