WI AB314 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 93.42 (5); and to create 13.94 (1) (ds), 20.192 (1) (c) and 238.24 of the statutes; Relating to: promoting the export of Wisconsin's agricultural and agribusiness products. (FE)
Title
Promoting the export of Wisconsin's agricultural and agribusiness products. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-03 | House | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-03 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 92 |
2021-12-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-12-2021 |
2021-11-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-8-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-10-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a second time |
2021-10-21 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-10-20 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-10-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-13 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-10-13 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Agriculture and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2021-10-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2021-09-30 | House | Representative Moses added as a coauthor |
2021-05-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2021-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced |