WI AB31 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 71.935 (4); to amend 71.935 (1) (a); and to create 71.935 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: setoffs against tax refunds for debts related to providing ambulance services. (FE)
Title
Setoffs against tax refunds for debts related to providing ambulance services. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-23 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2015-04-23 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2015-04-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-14 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2015-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab31 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB31.pdf |