WI AB31 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.445 (1) (gr), 111.397, 814.75 (28) and 893.995 of the statutes; relating to: authorizing the circuit court to order a person who engages in discrimination in employment to pay compensatory and punitive damages and a surcharge and making an appropriation.
Title
Authorizing the circuit court to order a person who engages in discrimination in employment to pay compensatory and punitive damages and a surcharge and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-28 | Assembly amendment 6 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Pridemore | |
2009-04-28 | Assembly amendment 5 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Honadel | |
2009-04-28 | Assembly amendment 4 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Honadel | |
2009-04-28 | Assembly amendment 3 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Honadel | |
2009-04-28 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Sinicki | |
2009-04-28 | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 4-28-2009 | |
2009-04-27 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca and Sinicki | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on calendar 4-28-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-04-23 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | |
2009-04-23 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | |
2009-04-16 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-13 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-08 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-07 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Sinicki | |
2009-02-27 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab31 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB31.pdf |