WI AB309 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.093 (2) (b); and to create 13.59, 13.591, 16.59, 20.505 (1) (bm) and 227.112 of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a Joint Committee on State Mandates and required funding of state mandates. (FE)
Title
Creation of a Joint Committee on State Mandates and required funding of state mandates. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab309 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB309.pdf |