WI AB309 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.11 (7) (am), 302.113 (9) (am), 302.114 (9) (am) and 304.06 (3); and to create 301.038 of the statutes; Relating to: limiting the number of annual revocations of extended supervision and parole for violations that are not a crime. (FE)
Title
Limiting the number of annual revocations of extended supervision and parole for violations that are not a crime. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2015-08-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab309 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB309.pdf |