WI AB308 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 941.26 (1c); to amend 941.26 (4) (a); and to create 941.26 (1c) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: pepper spray and CS gel substances.
Title
Pepper spray and CS gel substances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2019-10-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative McGuire |
2019-09-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab308 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB308.pdf |