WI AB308 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.227 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: the composition of the Council on Worker's Compensation.
Title
The composition of the Council on Worker's Compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 54, Noes 37 |
2018-01-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Spiros |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2017-12-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-12-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2017-11-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-11-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sinicki |
2017-11-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sinicki |
2017-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced |