WI AB308 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-09 - Published 10-20-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-09 - Published 10-20-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.02 (5), 346.02 (10), (11) and (12), 346.18 (1), 346.22 (1) (a) and 347.25 (1m) (b); and to create 346.215 of the statutes; relating to: police escorts and vehicle rights-of-way related to escorted vehicles and providing a penalty.
Title
Police escorts and vehicle rights-of-way related to escorted vehicles and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-09 | Published 10-20-2009 | |
2009-10-06 | Report approved by the Governor on 10-6-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 46 | |
2009-10-06 | Presented to the Governor on 10-5-2009 | |
2009-09-25 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2009-09-22 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-22 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2009-09-22 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-22 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-16 | Placed on calendar 9-22-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-09-03 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-09-03 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-03 | Executive action taken | |
2009-07-16 | Public hearing held | |
2009-06-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-06-23 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-06-23 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-06-23 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-06-23 | Rules suspended | |
2009-06-23 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-06-23 | Read a second time | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on calendar 6-23-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-06-18 | Report passage recommended by committee on Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-06-17 | Executive action taken | |
2009-06-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-06-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Safety | |
2009-06-08 | Introduced |