WI AB304 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.01 (2) and 15.06 (2); and to create 15.06 (1) (bb), 15.06 (3) (a) 5., 15.225 (3) and 103.355 of the statutes; Relating to: making companies that outsource jobs ineligible for state tax benefits, grants, and loans, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Making companies that outsource jobs ineligible for state tax benefits, grants, and loans, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-08-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-08-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab304 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB304.pdf |