WI AB300 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 19.36 (14), 66.0512 and 940.20 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: an election official's personal information, battery against election officials, whistleblower protection for municipal clerks, county clerks, and election officials who witness and report election fraud or irregularities, and providing a penalty.
Title
An election official's personal information, battery against election officials, whistleblower protection for municipal clerks, county clerks, and election officials who witness and report election fraud or irregularities, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-18 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2023-09-08 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-06-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-06-01 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and referred to committee on Campaigns and Elections pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2023-06-01 | House | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced |