WI AB300 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.30 (1m) (d), 118.30 (1r) (d), 118.30 (1s) (e) and 118.30 (1t) (e); and to create 118.303 of the statutes; Relating to: providing information about mandatory pupil examinations.
Title
Providing information about mandatory pupil examinations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2017-06-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2017-06-08 | House | LRB correction |
2017-06-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab300 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB300.pdf |