WI AB3 | 2018 | March Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 51.17 (2), 118.07 (5), 118.126 (1) (c), 118.126 (2), 904.085 (4) (d), 905.045 (4) and 905.06 (4); and to create 146.816 (2) (b) 5., 175.32 and 905.04 (4) (em) of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory reporting of suspected intent to carry out violence involving a dangerous weapon or explosive in or targeting a school and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Mandatory reporting of suspected intent to carry out violence involving a dangerous weapon or explosive in or targeting a school and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rodriguez |
2018-03-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen |
2018-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/mr8/asm/bill/ab3 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/MR8/AB3.pdf |