WI AB3 | 2017 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-19-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Published 7-18-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-19-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Published 7-18-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.443 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: immunity from revocation of probation, parole, or extended supervision for certain controlled substance offenses.
Title
Immunity from revocation of probation, parole, or extended supervision for certain controlled substance offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-17 | House | Published 7-18-2017 |
2017-07-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-17-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 33 |
2017-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor on 7-13-2017 |
2017-06-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017 |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 1 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | House | Representative Berceau added as a coauthor |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-01 | House | Representative Anderson added as a coauthor |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to calendar of 5-2-2017 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2017-04-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2017-04-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Ott and Nygren |
2017-04-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott |
2017-04-04 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2017-03-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-01 | House | Senator Johnson added as a cosponsor |
2017-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced |