WI AB3 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-23)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Published 3-27-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-23)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Published 3-27-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 450.19 (1); and to create 450.19 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: the exclusion of veterinarians from the prescription drug monitoring program.
Title
The exclusion of veterinarians from the prescription drug monitoring program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Published 3-27-2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-13-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 3 |
2013-03-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-12-2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-12-2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senator T. Cullen added as a cosponsor |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-02-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-02-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-02-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-02-12 | House | Representatives August, Barca, Barnes, Bies, Craig, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Honadel, Hutton, Johnson, Kaufert, Kleefisch, Klenke, Kolste, Kramer, Loudenbeck, Mason, Mursau, Nass, J. Ott, Petersen, Pridemore, Riemer, Sanfelippo, Sargent, Schraa, Severson, Shankland, Sinicki, Steineke, Stone, Strachota, Stroebel, Suder, C. Taylor, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Vos, Wright, Young and Zepnick added as coauthors |
2013-02-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on calendar 2-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Agriculture, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2013-02-05 | House | Representative Bernard Schaber added as a coauthor |
2013-02-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Agriculture |
2013-02-01 | House | Introduced |