WI AB3 | 2011 | September Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (5f) (c) 6., 71.28 (5f) (c) 6. and 71.47 (5f) (c) 6. of the statutes; relating to: the film production services tax credit application fee. (FE)
Title
The film production services tax credit application fee. (FE)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-13 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2011-11-03 | Laid on the table | |
2011-10-31 | Referred to Calendar 11-1-2011 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 | |
2011-10-31 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2011-10-31 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2011-10-25 | Executive action taken | |
2011-10-24 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-10-24 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Marklein | |
2011-10-19 | Public hearing held | |
2011-10-11 | Senator Schultz added as a cosponsor | |
2011-10-11 | Representatives Marklein and Krug added as coauthors | |
2011-10-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties | |
2011-10-11 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/se1/asm/bill/ab3 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/SE1/AB3.pdf |