WI AB298 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 5.25 (3); and to create 5.25 (3) (a) 1., 2. and 3., 5.25 (3) (b) and 5.25 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: polling place closures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Polling place closures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21HousePublished 3-22-2024
2024-03-21HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 124
2024-03-18HousePresented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
2024-02-19HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-19-2024
2024-02-19HouseLRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
2024-02-13HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2024-02-13SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2024-02-13SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2024-02-13SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2024-02-13SenateOrdered to a third reading
2024-02-13SenateRead a second time
2024-02-09SenatePlaced on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2024-02-09SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2024-01-11SenateAvailable for scheduling
2024-01-11SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2024-01-11SenateExecutive action taken
2023-11-13SenateSenator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
2023-11-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
2023-11-10SenateReceived from Assembly
2023-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2023-11-09HouseRepresentative Cabrera added as a coauthor
2023-11-09HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 2
2023-11-09HouseRules suspended
2023-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2023-11-09HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2023-11-09HouseRead a second time
2023-11-08HouseRepresentatives O'Connor and Maxey added as coauthors
2023-11-08HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sortwell and Ortiz-Velez
2023-11-08HouseRepresentative Penterman added as a coauthor
2023-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
2023-11-03HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2023-11-03HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 2
2023-11-03HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2023-07-12HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell
2023-06-20HouseExecutive action taken
2023-06-19HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell
2023-06-06HousePublic hearing held
2023-05-25HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2023-05-25HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab298
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/AB298.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2023/REG/AB298.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2023/124.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB298-AA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB298-AA1-AA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2023/REG/AB298-ASA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/assembly/campaigns_and_elections/1738079.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2023/REG/AB298.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/related/records/senate/shared_revenue_elections_and_consumer_protection/1769876.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcactmemos/2023/REG/Act%20124.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2023/av0120

Bill Comments

feedback