WI AB298 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 340.01 (5e), 340.01 (5m), 340.01 (10) (a), 340.01 (10) (b), 340.01 (38), 346.05 (1) (e), 346.09 (1), 346.31 (1), subchapter VI (title) of chapter 346 [precedes 346.37], 346.37 (1) (c) 1., 346.37 (2), 346.41 (1) (intro.), 346.52 (1) (c), (d) and (f), 346.54 (1) (a) to (d), 349.09, 349.10 (1) (b), 349.13 (1e) (c) 1. and 349.13 (1g); to repeal and recreate 346.09 (1); and to create 340.01 (42t) of the statutes; Relating to: highway pavement markings.
Title
Highway pavement markings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-09-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-08-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-08-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-08-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab298 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB298.pdf |