WI AB298 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 7.70 (3) (e); to amend 5.02 (12s), 5.35 (6) (b), 5.37 (4), 5.62 (1) (a), 5.62 (3), 5.81 (4), 5.91 (1), 5.91 (6), 8.15 (7), 8.16 (1), 8.20 (8) (a), 8.20 (9), 8.35 (4) (c), 8.50 (3) (b), 10.02 (3) (b) 2., 10.06 (1) (e), 10.06 (1) (i), 11.06 (1) (jm), 11.16 (5), 11.26 (17) (a), 11.31 (title), 11.31 (1) (intro.), 11.31 (7) (b) to (d) and 11.31 (8); and to create 5.62 (5), 7.08 (2) (c), 7.08 (2) (cm), 7.70 (3) (e) 1., 8.16 (5), 8.35 (4) (b), 10.02 (3) (b) 2m., 11.21 (15), 11.26 (9) (c), 11.26 (10), 11.26 (13), 11.31 (2), 11.31 (2m), 11.31 (3), 11.31 (3m), 11.31 (4), 11.31 (6), 11.31 (10), 11.50, 14.58 (20), 20.511 (1) (q), 20.855 (4) (b), 25.17 (1) (ys), 25.42 and 71.10 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a Wisconsin election campaign fund, making appropriations, and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Creation of a Wisconsin election campaign fund, making appropriations, and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up (Y: 39 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 59 |
2013-09-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2013-08-23 | House | Introduced |