WI AB295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.54 (1) (g) (intro.); and to create 71.54 (1) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the homestead tax credit maximum income. (FE)
Title
Increasing the homestead tax credit maximum income. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-20 | House | Representative McGuire added as a coauthor |
2019-06-18 | House | Representatives Bowen and Gruszynski added as coauthors |
2019-06-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab295 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB295.pdf |