WI AB295 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.14 (6r) (b) 1. and 341.14 (6r) (fm) 7.; and to create 20.395 (5) (ei), 25.40 (1) (a) 32., 341.14 (6r) (b) 15., 341.14 (6r) (f) 62. and 341.14 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: special distinguishing registration plates associated with the ALS Association and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Special distinguishing registration plates associated with the ALS Association and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Dean Kaufert [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Paul Farrow [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] |
Sen. John Lehman [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 87, Noes 4 |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2013-11-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2013-11-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-11-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Bernard Schaber, Kolste and Danou |
2013-09-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ripp |
2013-09-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-08-20 | House | Introduced |