WI AB293 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Representative Ripp added as a coauthor
Pending: Joint Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 20.435 (1) (cf) and 252.185 of the statutes; Relating to: communicable disease control and prevention funding. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communicable disease control and prevention funding. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-19HouseRepresentative Ripp added as a coauthor
2017-06-13HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2017-06-13HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-06-13HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2017-06-06HouseExecutive action taken
2017-06-02HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl
2017-05-25HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-05-17HousePublic hearing held
2017-05-15HouseRepresentative Kolste added as a coauthor
2017-05-01HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2017-05-01HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback