WI AB29 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 29.184 (6g) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: the governor's bear tag.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The governor's bear tag.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-11HousePlaced on calendar 3-17-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2021-02-17HouseExecutive action taken
2021-02-10HousePublic hearing held
2021-01-29HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage
2021-01-29HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback