WI AB29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative C. Taylor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 29.097 and 29.971 (1n) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting contests for killing wild animals and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting contests for killing wild animals and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative C. Taylor
2019-03-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-02-28HouseRepresentative Doyle withdrawn as a coauthor
2019-02-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback