WI AB29 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 457.08 (4) (c) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: practice requirement for licensure as a clinical social worker. (FE)
Title
Practice requirement for licensure as a clinical social worker. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - Assembly: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 356 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-1-2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-21 | House | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-06-13 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-06-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-06-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2017-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-02-21 | House | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227(6)(b), Wisconsin Statutes, by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2017-01-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-27 | House | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.19(6)(a), Wisconsin Statutes |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced |