WI AB29 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0414 of the statutes; Relating to: limiting the authority of a law enforcement officer to arrest someone for sleeping or camping in a county park, authorizing local ordinances to prohibit overnight sleeping or camping in a county park, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Limiting the authority of a law enforcement officer to arrest someone for sleeping or camping in a county park, authorizing local ordinances to prohibit overnight sleeping or camping in a county park, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and take up (Y: 36 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-04-14 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 63 |
2015-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced |