WI AB289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 53. of the statutes; Relating to: exempting from taxation the value of Olympic medals and certain payments received by Olympic athletes. (FE)
Title
Exempting from taxation the value of Olympic medals and certain payments received by Olympic athletes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-08-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-08-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-08-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-06-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2017-06-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-15 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2017-05-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab289 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB289.pdf |