WI AB289 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 256.01 (6), (7), (8) and (9) and 256.15 (2) (a); and to create 256.15 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting out-of-state emergency medical services personnel from licensure requirements.
Title
Exempting out-of-state emergency medical services personnel from licensure requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-27 | House | Representative Meyers added as a coauthor |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-27-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2015-09-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-07-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-07-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab289 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB289.pdf |