WI AB288 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.147 (6) (a) (intro.); and to create 49.147 (6) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for a job access loan to repair or purchase a vehicle. (FE)
Title
Eligibility for a job access loan to repair or purchase a vehicle. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-10-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-09-25 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2017-09-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2017-06-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2017-06-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab288 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB288.pdf |