WI AB287 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.44 (4) (a) (intro.), 1. (intro.), 2. and 3., 118.44 (4) (b) (intro.), (c) and (d) and 118.44 (7) (a); to repeal and recreate 118.44 (4) (title); and to create 118.44 (4) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: the Achievement Gap Reduction program. (FE)
Title
The Achievement Gap Reduction program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-27-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-09-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-09-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-08 | House | LRB correction |
2015-09-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Czaja |
2015-07-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-07-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-07-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab287 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB287.pdf |