WI AB285 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 84.06 (2) (a); and to create 84.06 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: bidding procedures for highway improvements. (FE)
Title
Bidding procedures for highway improvements. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-26-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 5 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-06-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2019-06-19 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 5) |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 5 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 7, Noes 6 |
2019-06-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2019-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2019-06-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Sanfelippo |
2019-06-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-13 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2019-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2019-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2019-06-11 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-06-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-06-07 | House | Introduced |