WI AB284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.01 (4) and 227.01 (1); and to create 15.137 (7), 20.235 (1) (em), 39.52 and 71.05 (6) (b) 53. of the statutes; Relating to: creating a program for reimbursing the higher education debt of small farm operators, creating an individual income tax deduction for certain amounts received from such a program, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Creating a program for reimbursing the higher education debt of small farm operators, creating an individual income tax deduction for certain amounts received from such a program, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2017-05-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab284 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB284.pdf |