WI AB283 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 5.05 (11m) and 20.510 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: aids to counties and municipalities for certain special election costs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Aids to counties and municipalities for certain special election costs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-10-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2023-10-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2023-06-20 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2023-06-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-06-14 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-06-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2023-05-17 | House | Introduced |