WI AB281 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 450.02 (2); to amend 146.81 (1) (fm), 146.997 (1) (d) 8., 450.01 (16) (g), 450.01 (21e) (a), 450.02 (3) (f), 450.03 (1) (e), 450.03 (1) (i), 450.035 (2h), 450.035 (2i) (a) and (b), 450.035 (3), 450.035 (4), 450.062 (intro.), 450.08 (1), 450.08 (2) (b), 450.10 (1) (a) 1., 450.10 (1) (a) 2., 450.10 (1) (a) 3., 450.10 (1) (a) 6., 450.10 (1) (b) (intro.), 450.10 (1) (b) 3., 450.10 (2), 450.10 (3) (a) 1., 450.11 (1b) (bm), 450.11 (1b) (d), 450.11 (1b) (e) 2., 450.11 (3), 450.11 (7) (d), 450.11 (8) (a) and 450.17; to repeal and recreate 146.89 (1) (r) 4. and 450.08 (title); and to create 440.03 (13) (b) 48m., 440.08 (2) (a) 56m., 450.01 (15g), 450.01 (16c), 450.02 (2) (b), 450.03 (1) (gm) and 450.068 of the statutes; Relating to: registration of pharmacy technicians, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Registration of pharmacy technicians, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-07-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-04-20 | House | Introduced |