WI AB28 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 346.37 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: traffic control at nonfunctioning or malfunctioning traffic control signals.
Title
Traffic control at nonfunctioning or malfunctioning traffic control signals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 42 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-29-2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-03-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced |