WI AB274 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 941.29 (2); to amend 813.12 (2) (c) 1., 813.122 (2) (b) 1., 813.123 (5) (a) 2. a., 813.125 (4) (a) 2. a., 938.341, 941.29 (1), 941.29 (3), 941.29 (4), 971.17 (1g) and 973.176 (1); and to create 941.29 (1) (bt) and 941.29 (1) (bx) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of firearms by individuals who commit multiple or violent misdemeanor offenses and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Possession of firearms by individuals who commit multiple or violent misdemeanor offenses and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-07-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-06-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab274 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB274.pdf |