WI AB273 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 895.035 (4a) (a) 2., 938.34 (14q), 941.291 (1) (b), 946.82 (4), 969.08 (10) (b) and 973.137 (1m); and to create 947.019 of the statutes; Relating to: making a false threat to use a firearm to injure or kill another person in a school zone and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Making a false threat to use a firearm to injure or kill another person in a school zone and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Representative Kolste added as a coauthor |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:08 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Doyle |
2016-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-07-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-06-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab273 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB273.pdf |