WI AB272 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.15 (3) (f) 2.; and to create 348.15 (3) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: weight limit exceptions for vehicles equipped with idle reduction technology or natural gas fuel systems. (FE)
Title
Weight limit exceptions for vehicles equipped with idle reduction technology or natural gas fuel systems. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-07 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-06-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab272 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB272.pdf |