WI AB272 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.172 (1), 13.48 (13) (a), 13.62 (2), 13.94 (4) (a) 1., 13.95 (intro.), 16.002 (2), 16.004 (4), 16.004 (5), 16.004 (12) (a), 16.045 (1) (a), 16.15 (1) (ab), 16.41 (4), 16.417 (1) (b), 16.52 (7), 16.528 (1) (a), 16.53 (2), 16.54 (9) (a) 1., 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 16.765 (5), 16.765 (6), 16.765 (7) (intro.), 16.765 (7) (d), 16.765 (8), 16.85 (2), 16.865 (8), 71.05 (6) (b) 28. (intro.), am. and h., 77.54 (9a) (a), 100.45 (1) (dm) and 230.03 (3); to repeal and recreate 230.03 (3); and to create 13.94 (1) (dt), 13.94 (1s) (c) 9., 19.42 (10) (t), 19.42 (13) (p), 20.195, 39.28 (7), 39.52, 39.54, 39.56, 40.02 (54) (n), 70.11 (38v), 71.05 (6) (b) 28. j., 224.30 (5) and chapter 239 of the statutes; Relating to: student loans, the individual income tax subtract modification for tuition and student fees, creating an authority to be known as the Wisconsin Student Loan Refinancing Authority, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Student loans, the individual income tax subtract modification for tuition and student fees, creating an authority to be known as the Wisconsin Student Loan Refinancing Authority, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-19 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 60 |
2015-11-03 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Ways and Means and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 61 |
2015-07-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-06-22 | House | Introduced |