WI AB271 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 443.06 (2) (a), 443.06 (2) (b), 443.06 (2) (c) and 443.06 (2) (e); to renumber and amend 443.01 (4); to amend 15.405 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b), 26.09 (3) (b) 1., 30.11 (3), 30.13 (3) (a), 59.20 (2) (c), 59.43 (8), 59.45 (1) (a) 2., 59.45 (1) (b), 59.45 (3), 59.46, 59.73 (2), 59.74 (2) (b) 1., 59.74 (2) (c), 59.74 (2) (g), 59.74 (2) (h), 59.74 (2) (j), 59.75, 60.84 (1), 84.095 (5), 157.07 (1), 236.02 (2m), 236.15 (1) (a), 236.15 (1) (d), 236.15 (2), 236.16 (3) (title), 236.16 (4) (title), 236.20 (2) (g), 236.34 (1) (a), 440.03 (13) (b) 34., 440.08 (2) (a) 39., chapter 443 (title), 443.01 (3), 443.02 (4), 443.06 (title), 443.06 (1) (title), 443.06 (1) (a), 443.06 (1) (b), 443.06 (2) (intro.), 443.06 (2) (am), 443.06 (2) (bm), 443.06 (2) (cm), 443.06 (2) (d), 443.06 (2) (em), 443.06 (3), 443.10 (title), 443.10 (2) (b), 443.10 (2) (b), 443.10 (5), 443.10 (5), 443.12 (title), 443.12 (1), 443.12 (3), 443.14 (8) (a), 443.14 (8) (c), 443.14 (8) (d), 443.14 (9), 443.14 (11), 443.18 (2) (a), 443.18 (2) (b), 470.025 (7), 707.215 (5) (intro.), 709.02 (1), 709.07 and 893.37; to repeal and recreate 440.08 (2) (a) 39.; and to create 59.001 (2k), 236.025, 236.20 (6), 443.01 (1g), 443.01 (1r), 443.01 (3b), 443.01 (6s) (a) 1. and 2., 443.01 (6s) (a) 4. c. and d., 443.01 (6s) (a) 6. to 8., 443.01 (6s) (b), 443.01 (7m), 443.135, 895.477 and 943.13 (4m) (d) of the statutes; relating to: professional land surveyors, the practice of professional land surveying, surveying land abutting navigable waters, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Professional land surveyors, the practice of professional land surveying, surveying land abutting navigable waters, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-24 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-24 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | |
2010-03-24 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-23 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-04 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Risser | |
2010-01-07 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development | |
2009-10-28 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-27 | Representative Hilgenberg added as a coauthor | |
2009-10-27 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Clark | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended to return to amendable stage | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Clark | |
2009-10-27 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Clark | |
2009-10-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-27 | LRB correction (Assembly substitute amendment 1) | |
2009-10-21 | Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-21 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-21 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 1 | |
2009-10-21 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-21 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-19 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Clark | |
2009-08-26 | Senator Schultz withdrawn as a cosponsor | |
2009-07-01 | Public hearing held | |
2009-05-28 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time and referred to committee on Consumer Protection | |
2009-05-19 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab271 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB271.pdf |