WI AB27 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 36-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Published 5-21-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 36-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Published 5-21-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.57 (4) (gm) of the statutes; Relating to: the maximum speed limit on freeways and expressways. (FE)
Title
The maximum speed limit on freeways and expressways. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Published 5-21-2015 |
2015-05-20 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 5-20-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 19 |
2015-05-19 | House | Presented to the Governor on 5-19-2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-19-2015 |
2015-05-13 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-13 | House | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in |
2015-05-06 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | House | Representatives Mason, Allen, Young and Johnson added as coauthors |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 76, Noes 22 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Read a second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spiros |
2015-02-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced |