WI AB268 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 157.061 (9) and 440.70 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of mausoleums.
Title
Regulation of mausoleums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-08-07 | House | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor |
2015-07-28 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2015-06-24 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2015-06-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-06-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab268 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB268.pdf |