WI AB267 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.08 (1m) (b); and to create 15.405 (7e), 440.08 (2) (a) 39m., 440.08 (2) (a) 64g., 448.695 (3) and chapter 462 of the statutes; relating to: licenses and limited X-ray machine operator permits to engage in the practice of radiography, creating a radiography examining board, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
Licenses and limited X-ray machine operator permits to engage in the practice of radiography, creating a radiography examining board, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-11-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2009-11-04 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-03 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 82, Noes 11 | |
2009-11-03 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-03 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on calendar 11-3-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-29 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-29 | Report passage recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 1 | |
2009-10-28 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-08 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | |
2009-09-08 | Report passage recommended by committee on Public Health, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-08-25 | Executive action taken | |
2009-07-14 | Public hearing held | |
2009-05-21 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-05-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health | |
2009-05-12 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab267 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB267.pdf |