WI AB266 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.370 (4) (ad); and to create 20.370 (4) (ad) of the statutes; Relating to: a flood risk reduction pilot project and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A flood risk reduction pilot project and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2019-10-31 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2019-10-29 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-10-29 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-09-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-08-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-15 | House | Representative Gruszynski added as a coauthor |
2019-08-15 | House | Representative Plumer added as a coauthor |
2019-08-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2019-07-30 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2019-06-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-11 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-06-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development |
2019-06-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab266 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB266.pdf |