WI AB264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 995.50 (2); and to create 995.50 (2) (bm) and 995.60 of the statutes; Relating to: the use of a surveillance device by an owner of real estate in connection with the sale of the real estate and providing a penalty.
Title
The use of a surveillance device by an owner of real estate in connection with the sale of the real estate and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Science and Technology, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-27 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2019-08-16 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2019-06-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2019-06-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab264 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB264.pdf |