WI AB263 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: discontinuance of certain special group plates. (FE)
Title
Discontinuance of certain special group plates. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-05-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduced |