WI AB261 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.38 (4) (a) (intro.), 118.38 (4) (a) 2. a., 118.38 (4) (a) 2. b. and 118.38 (4) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the department of public instruction's waiver authority related to parental choice programs, the Special Needs Scholarship Program, and independent charter schools.
Title
The department of public instruction's waiver authority related to parental choice programs, the Special Needs Scholarship Program, and independent charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke |
2021-04-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke |
2021-04-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-04-14 | House | Introduced |