WI AB260 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.33 (4e) of the statutes; Relating to: open alcohol containers in or on all-terrain or utility terrain vehicles.
Title
Open alcohol containers in or on all-terrain or utility terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-18 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2023-09-01 | House | Senator Agard added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-05 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-05-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2023-05-08 | House | Introduced |